This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:21:53 (UTC).

JUAN MENDOZA VS ROSENDA LUNA

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 JUAN MENDOZA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ROSENDA LUNA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PALAFOX, JULIE A.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1687

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

PALAFOX, JULIE A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MENDOZA, JUAN MANUEL SORIANO

Respondent

LUNA, ROSENDA HERNANDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

HERNANDEZ, ROXANNE L

KEESE HARGRAVES, LLP

Respondent Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JUANA TREJO

Other Attorneys

GONZALEZ, DAVID

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • TRIAL - LONG CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • MINUTE ORDER 03/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • TRIAL - LONG CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • STIPULATION & ORDER 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • CONFERENCE - MANDATORY SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • WAGE ASSIGN ORDER - SPOUSAL / PARTNER SUPPORT 10/23/2018; Filing Party: LUNA, ROSENDA HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 10/17/2018 Income & Expense Declaration; Filing Party: LUNA, ROSENDA HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 08/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • CONFERENCE - MANDATORY SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2016
  • RFO - SPOUSAL SUPPORT 05/03/2016 Amount:$60.00; Filing Party: LUNA, ROSENDA HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 04/22/2016; Filing Party: LUNA, ROSENDA HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 04/22/2016; Filing Party: LUNA, ROSENDA HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 04/22/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: LUNA, ROSENDA HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 04/22/2016; Filing Party: LUNA, ROSENDA HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 04/22/2016; Filing Party: LUNA, ROSENDA HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MENDOZA, JUAN MANUEL SORIANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MENDOZA, JUAN MANUEL SORIANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: MENDOZA, JUAN MANUEL SORIANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MENDOZA, JUAN MANUEL SORIANO

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.