This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:47:57 (UTC).

JUAN J. MEDINA VS. NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 JUAN J MEDINA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUAN J. MEDINA

Defendant

NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT STARR

Defendant Attorney

SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS (US) LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11977642 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11801771.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11977642 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11801771.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC. ON 06/02/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC. ON 06/02/2016

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 02/26/2016.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MEDINA, JUAN J. ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MEDINA, JUAN J. ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY MEDINA, JUAN J. ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY MEDINA, JUAN J. ON 02/26/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MEDINA, JUAN J. ON 05/16/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MEDINA, JUAN J. ON 05/16/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928233 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752451.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928233 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752451.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MEDINA, JUAN J. ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MEDINA, JUAN J. ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11976856 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11800985.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11976856 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11800985.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/09/2016 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/09/2016 08:45:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MEDINA, JUAN J. ON 08/29/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MEDINA, JUAN J. ON 08/29/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/09/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/09/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MEDINA, JUAN J. ON 05/31/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MEDINA, JUAN J. ON 05/31/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC. ON 06/02/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC. ON 06/02/2016

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MEDINA, JUAN J. ON 08/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2489319 RECEIVED ON 08/29/2016 12:07:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/09/2016 08:45:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/22/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/19/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • ADR REVIEW HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/18/2017 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11977642 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11801771.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MEDINA, JUAN J. ON 05/31/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1325302 RECEIVED ON 06/02/2016 10:13:12 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MEDINA, JUAN J. ON 05/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3414090 RECEIVED ON 05/16/2016 11:10:25 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/09/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928233 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752451.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MEDINA, JUAN J. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MEDINA, JUAN J. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MEDINA, JUAN J. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1307104 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 03:52:29 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.