This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/23/2022 at 06:25:18 (UTC).

JU YOUNG YOU VS. YOUNG CHUL RHO

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 JU YOUNG YOU filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against YOUNG CHUL RHO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ju Young You

Mi Seon Yoon Kim

Yunsue K. Kang

Defendants

C&H Trust Deed Service

Young Chul Rho

Young Sim Rho

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Yonsei Law Firm

Kwon, Jean

Defendant Attorneys

Halavais & Associates, APC

LK Professional Law Group

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY RHO, YOUNG CHUL ON 02/22/2022

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY RHO, YOUNG CHUL ON 02/22/2022

OPPOSITION FILED BY YOU, JU YOUNG; KIM, MI SEON YOON; KANG, YUNSUE K. ON 02/14/2022

OPPOSITION FILED BY YOU, JU YOUNG; KIM, MI SEON YOON; KANG, YUNSUE K. ON 02/14/2022

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY KIM, MI SEON YOON ON 02/04/2022

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY KIM, MI SEON YOON ON 02/04/2022

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY KANG, YUNSUE K. ON 02/04/2022

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY KANG, YUNSUE K. ON 02/04/2022

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY KIM, MI SEON YOON ON 02/04/2022

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY KIM, MI SEON YOON ON 02/04/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED 01/31/2022 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED 01/31/2022 09:00:00 AM.

RESPONSE (TO OSC) FILED BY YOU, JU YOUNG; KANG, YUNSUE K.; KIM, MI SEON YOON ON 01/26/2022

RESPONSE (TO OSC) FILED BY YOU, JU YOUNG; KANG, YUNSUE K.; KIM, MI SEON YOON ON 01/26/2022

CASE REASSIGNED TO MICHAEL STRICKROTH EFFECTIVE 01/31/2022.

CASE REASSIGNED TO MICHAEL STRICKROTH EFFECTIVE 01/31/2022.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/20/2021 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/20/2021 09:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 180.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 180.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12966487 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12794410.

MOTION TO DEEM ANSWERS ADMITTED FILED BY RHO, YOUNG CHUL ON 11/03/2021

MOTION TO DEEM ANSWERS ADMITTED FILED BY RHO, YOUNG CHUL ON 11/03/2021

MOTION TO DEEM ANSWERS ADMITTED FILED BY RHO, YOUNG CHUL ON 11/03/2021

MOTION TO DEEM ANSWERS ADMITTED FILED BY RHO, YOUNG CHUL ON 11/03/2021

MOTION TO DEEM ANSWERS ADMITTED FILED BY RHO, YOUNG CHUL ON 11/03/2021

MOTION TO DEEM ANSWERS ADMITTED FILED BY RHO, YOUNG CHUL ON 11/03/2021

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY KIM, MI SEON YOON ON 09/22/2021

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY KIM, MI SEON YOON ON 09/22/2021

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY YOU, JU YOUNG ON 09/22/2021

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY YOU, JU YOUNG ON 09/22/2021

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY YOU, JU YOUNG ON 09/22/2021

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY YOU, JU YOUNG ON 09/22/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12923180 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12751025.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12923180 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12751025.

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: COURT TRIAL; Judge: STRICKROTH; Department: C15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • HearingDescription: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: STRICKROTH; Department: C15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED; Judge: STRICKROTH; Department: C15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED; Judge: STRICKROTH; Department: C15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED; Judge: STRICKROTH; Department: C15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY RHO, YOUNG CHUL ON 02/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21125278 RECEIVED ON 02/22/2022 10:10:54 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPPOSITION FILED BY YOU, JU YOUNG; KIM, MI SEON YOON; KANG, YUNSUE K. ON 02/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21122708 RECEIVED ON 02/14/2022 05:14:51 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21119243 RECEIVED ON 02/04/2022 04:34:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31041323 RECEIVED ON 07/21/2021 12:15:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1872913 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31036383 RECEIVED ON 07/08/2021 02:50:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS FILED BY C&H TRUST DEED SERVICE ON 07/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/20/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12906305 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12734124.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31032680 RECEIVED ON 06/29/2021 07:14:49 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER ZELTZER, NANCY ON 06/29/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY YOU, JU YOUNG; KANG, YUNSUE K.; KIM, MI SEON YOON ON 06/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY YOU, JU YOUNG; KANG, YUNSUE K.; KIM, MI SEON YOON ON 06/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C & H TRUST DEED SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KWON ESQ, JEAN