This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 06:49:28 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. VS. RUDY ARVIZU

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RUDY ARVIZU. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Defendant

Rudy Arvizu

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Moore Law Group, APC

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/17/2021 10:56:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/17/2021 10:56:00 AM.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 09/16/2021

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 09/16/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 09/09/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 09/09/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 08/23/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 08/23/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/30/2021 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/30/2021 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12910904 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12738780.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12910904 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12738780.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 07/09/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 07/09/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 07/09/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 07/09/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 07/09/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 07/09/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2025
  • HearingDescription: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE; Judge: OMNI; Department: C66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/17/2021 10:56:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketTHE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 10/20/2025 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT C66.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 10/20/2025 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketTHE CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE OMNIBUS CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO OMNI EFFECTIVE 09/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31062926 RECEIVED ON 09/16/2021 07:35:18 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 09/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 09/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 08/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41231737 RECEIVED ON 08/23/2021 11:30:59 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/30/2021 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SALTER, GLENN ON 07/09/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12910904 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12738780.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 07/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 07/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 07/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31036600 RECEIVED ON 07/09/2021 07:46:09 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant