This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:23:16 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. VS. KAITE L. SHOEMAKER

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KAITE L SHOEMAKER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

Defendants

RICHARD R. FARINO

KAITE L. SHOEMAKER

KATIE L. SHOEMAKER

CARLOS CAVALLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SOLOMON, GRINDLE, SILVERMAN & WINTRING

SOLOMON, GRINDLE, SILVERMAN & WINTRINGER, APC

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 08/12/2013

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 03/04/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 03/04/2014

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 11/12/2013

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 11/12/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 09/10/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 09/10/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 05/28/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 05/28/2014

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 08/12/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 10/15/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 10/15/2013

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 10/15/2013

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 10/15/2013

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/24/2014 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C63 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/24/2014 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C63 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 11/12/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 11/12/2013

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 03/28/2014

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 03/28/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/24/2014 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/24/2014 01:30:00 PM.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 09/10/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 09/10/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 03/04/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 03/04/2014

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 05/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2338057 RECEIVED ON 05/28/2014 01:35:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 03/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2321410 RECEIVED ON 03/28/2014 10:58:43 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/24/2014 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 06/23/2014 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/23/2014 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C63 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 03/04/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 10/15/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2287192 RECEIVED ON 10/14/2013 02:20:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 09/10/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 09/10/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 358391 RECEIVED ON 09/10/2013 03:14:29 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 348067 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 08:36:58 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less