This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 12:26:48 (UTC).

JOSUE JOE RODRIGUEZ VS. MARGUERITE QUATANNENS

Case Summary

On 01/31/2018 JOSUE JOE RODRIGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARGUERITE QUATANNENS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSUE JOE RODRIGUEZ

Defendant

MARGUERITE QUATANNENS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALDERLAW, PC

LAW OFFICES OF CHARLES CLARK

Defendant Attorney

THOMPSON COE & O'MEARA, LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY QUATANNENS, MARGUERITE ON 05/07/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY QUATANNENS, MARGUERITE ON 05/07/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/25/2019 02:35:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/25/2019 02:35:00 PM.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, JOSUE JOE ON 01/23/2019

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, JOSUE JOE ON 01/23/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12476185 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12299854.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12476185 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12299854.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY QUATANNENS, MARGUERITE ON 01/02/2019

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY QUATANNENS, MARGUERITE ON 01/02/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/02/2019 11:35:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/02/2019 11:35:00 AM.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/26/2018

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/26/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/01/2018 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/01/2018 09:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12358961 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12182731.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12358961 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12182731.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, JOSUE JOE ON 05/30/2018

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, JOSUE JOE ON 05/30/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, JOSUE JOE ON 05/18/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, JOSUE JOE ON 05/18/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY QUATANNENS, MARGUERITE ON 05/18/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY QUATANNENS, MARGUERITE ON 05/18/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12328102 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12151848.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12328102 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12151848.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY QUATANNENS, MARGUERITE ON 04/02/2018

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY QUATANNENS, MARGUERITE ON 04/02/2018

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY QUATANNENS, MARGUERITE ON 04/02/2018

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY QUATANNENS, MARGUERITE ON 04/02/2018

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2019
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY QUATANNENS, MARGUERITE ON 05/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1620573 RECEIVED ON 05/07/2019 02:04:59 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/25/2019 02:35:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • THE CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE OMNIBUS CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 03/25/2020 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT C66.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO OMNI EFFECTIVE 03/25/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/25/2020 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2656217 RECEIVED ON 04/02/2018 11:57:39 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, JOSUE JOE ON 03/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3642620 RECEIVED ON 03/05/2018 12:07:29 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/01/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 01/31/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12292113 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12115876.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, JOSUE JOE ON 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, JOSUE JOE ON 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, JOSUE JOE ON 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2636209 RECEIVED ON 01/31/2018 04:06:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less