This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 08:31:16 (UTC).

JOSHUA CRINER VS. CANUS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 JOSHUA CRINER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CANUS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joshua Criner

Defendant

Canus Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEST COAST EMPLOYMENT LAWYERS, APLC

Defendant Attorney

Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 10/06/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 10/06/2021

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 09/21/2021

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 09/21/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12870679 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12698338.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12870679 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12698338.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CANUS CORPORATION ON 03/24/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CANUS CORPORATION ON 03/24/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12865245 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12692924.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12865245 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12692924.

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 03/09/2021

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 03/09/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 03/09/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 03/09/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 03/09/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 03/09/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/15/2021 08:17:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/15/2021 08:17:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CANUS CORPORATION ON 03/09/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CANUS CORPORATION ON 03/09/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12819437 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12646501.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12819437 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12646501.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CANUS CORPORATION ON 12/10/2020

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CANUS CORPORATION ON 12/10/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 10/15/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 10/15/2020

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/24/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/24/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 09/02/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 09/02/2020

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 08/17/2020.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 08/17/2020.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12768824 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12595360.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12768824 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12595360.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 10/06/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31070843 RECEIVED ON 10/06/2021 08:13:22 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41242907 RECEIVED ON 09/21/2021 11:02:55 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 09/21/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12870679 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12698338.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2998118 RECEIVED ON 03/24/2021 12:17:35 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12865245 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12692924.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1820552 RECEIVED ON 03/09/2021 06:18:03 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3946144 RECEIVED ON 10/15/2020 03:22:10 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/24/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 09/02/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3933316 RECEIVED ON 09/02/2020 12:49:06 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12768824 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12595360.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41106541 RECEIVED ON 08/17/2020 10:43:20 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 08/17/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 08/17/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 08/17/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 08/17/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less