**********************-CJC
08/17/2020
Not Classified By Court
Labor - Other Labor
Orange, California
Joshua Criner
Canus Corporation
WEST COAST EMPLOYMENT LAWYERS, APLC
Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman LLP
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 10/06/2021
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 09/21/2021
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12870679 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12698338.
NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CANUS CORPORATION ON 03/24/2021
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12865245 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12692924.
NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 03/09/2021
NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 03/09/2021
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 03/09/2021
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/15/2021 08:17:00 AM.
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CANUS CORPORATION ON 03/09/2021
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12819437 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12646501.
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CANUS CORPORATION ON 12/10/2020
PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 10/15/2020
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/24/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 09/02/2020
CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 08/17/2020.
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12768824 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12595360.
DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
[-] Read LessDocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.
[-] Read LessDocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 10/06/2021
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31070843 RECEIVED ON 10/06/2021 08:13:22 AM.
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41242907 RECEIVED ON 09/21/2021 11:02:55 AM.
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 09/21/2021
[-] Read LessDocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12870679 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12698338.
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2998118 RECEIVED ON 03/24/2021 12:17:35 PM.
[-] Read LessDocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12865245 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12692924.
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1820552 RECEIVED ON 03/09/2021 06:18:03 PM.
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3946144 RECEIVED ON 10/15/2020 03:22:10 PM.
[-] Read LessDocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/24/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
[-] Read LessDocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 09/02/2020
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3933316 RECEIVED ON 09/02/2020 12:49:06 PM.
[-] Read LessDocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12768824 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12595360.
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41106541 RECEIVED ON 08/17/2020 10:43:20 AM.
[-] Read LessDocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 08/17/2020.
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 08/17/2020
[-] Read LessDocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 08/17/2020
[-] Read LessDocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY CRINER, JOSHUA ON 08/17/2020
[-] Read Less