This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/26/2023 at 03:44:52 (UTC).

JOSEPH SANTOS VS. FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 JOSEPH SANTOS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Santos

Defendant

Ford Motor Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Neale & Fhima APC

Defendant Attorney

Gates, Gonter, Guy, Proudfoot & Muench, LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY SANTOS, JOSEPH ON 01/11/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY SANTOS, JOSEPH ON 01/11/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SANTOS, JOSEPH ON 01/11/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SANTOS, JOSEPH ON 01/11/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SANTOS, JOSEPH ON 01/11/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SANTOS, JOSEPH ON 01/11/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13163735 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12991832.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13163735 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12991832.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY SANTOS, JOSEPH ON 01/18/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY SANTOS, JOSEPH ON 01/18/2023

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY ON 02/14/2023

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY ON 02/14/2023

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY ON 02/14/2023

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY ON 02/14/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13180863 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13008990.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13180863 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13008990.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SCHWARM; Department: C32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13180863 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13008990.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31268860 RECEIVED ON 02/13/2023 10:16:59 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY ON 02/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY ON 02/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41447252 RECEIVED ON 02/13/2023 10:17:01 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY SANTOS, JOSEPH ON 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21260389 RECEIVED ON 01/18/2023 08:08:52 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13163735 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12991832.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41433464 RECEIVED ON 01/11/2023 01:33:19 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 01/11/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SANTOS, JOSEPH ON 01/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SANTOS, JOSEPH ON 01/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SANTOS, JOSEPH ON 01/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less