This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:52:20 (UTC).

JOSEPH LIPSHIN VS. MCNIB CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 JOSEPH LIPSHIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MCNIB CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSEPH LIPSHIN

Defendant

MCNIB CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIBSON & HUGHES

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF TRACEY LAZARUS

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY LIPSHIN, JOSEPH ON 05/23/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY LIPSHIN, JOSEPH ON 05/23/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11963941 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11788086.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11963941 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11788086.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MCNIB CORPORATION ON 05/06/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MCNIB CORPORATION ON 05/06/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MCNIB CORPORATION ON 05/06/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MCNIB CORPORATION ON 05/06/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/26/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/26/2016 09:00:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LIPSHIN, JOSEPH ON 05/13/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LIPSHIN, JOSEPH ON 05/13/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11963967 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11788112.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11963967 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11788112.

COMPLAINT FILED BY LIPSHIN, JOSEPH ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY LIPSHIN, JOSEPH ON 02/26/2016

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY LIPSHIN, JOSEPH ON 02/06/2017

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY LIPSHIN, JOSEPH ON 02/06/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LIPSHIN, JOSEPH ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LIPSHIN, JOSEPH ON 02/26/2016

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BANKS, ANDREW ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BANKS, ANDREW ON 02/26/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927181 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751406.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927181 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751406.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/26/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/26/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY MCNIB CORPORATION ON 01/30/2017

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY MCNIB CORPORATION ON 01/30/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LIPSHIN, JOSEPH ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LIPSHIN, JOSEPH ON 02/26/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/10/2017 08:51:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/10/2017 08:51:00 AM.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY LIPSHIN, JOSEPH ON 05/09/2017

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY LIPSHIN, JOSEPH ON 05/09/2017

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY LIPSHIN, JOSEPH ON 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3548498 RECEIVED ON 05/23/2017 11:29:40 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/10/2017 08:51:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 07/13/2017 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 07/13/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY LIPSHIN, JOSEPH ON 05/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4721087 RECEIVED ON 05/09/2017 10:27:20 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11963941 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11788086.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MCNIB CORPORATION ON 05/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3410832 RECEIVED ON 05/06/2016 08:53:24 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/26/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BANKS, ANDREW ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927181 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751406.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LIPSHIN, JOSEPH ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LIPSHIN, JOSEPH ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY LIPSHIN, JOSEPH ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509456 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 10:08:56 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.