This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/30/2019 at 07:38:46 (UTC).

JOSE VASQUEZ VS. ARDEN ENGINEERING, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/18/2019 JOSE VASQUEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ARDEN ENGINEERING, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Vasquez

Defendants

Cadence Aerospace, LLC

Arden Engineering, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Dominguez Firm, LLP

Defendant Attorney

Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY VASQUEZ, JOSE ON 07/18/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY VASQUEZ, JOSE ON 07/18/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VASQUEZ, JOSE ON 07/18/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VASQUEZ, JOSE ON 07/18/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VASQUEZ, JOSE ON 07/18/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VASQUEZ, JOSE ON 07/18/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12589395 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12413434.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12589395 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12413434.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 07/18/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 07/18/2019.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/15/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/15/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VASQUEZ, JOSE ON 08/12/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VASQUEZ, JOSE ON 08/12/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VASQUEZ, JOSE ON 08/12/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VASQUEZ, JOSE ON 08/12/2019

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY VASQUEZ, JOSE ON 09/25/2019

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY VASQUEZ, JOSE ON 09/25/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ARDEN ENGINEERING, INC. ON 09/16/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ARDEN ENGINEERING, INC. ON 09/16/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CADENCE AEROSPACE, LLC ON 09/16/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CADENCE AEROSPACE, LLC ON 09/16/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12628309 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12452808.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12628309 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12452808.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12628309 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12452808.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CADENCE AEROSPACE, LLC ON 09/16/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ARDEN ENGINEERING, INC. ON 09/16/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1666512 RECEIVED ON 09/16/2019 03:06:11 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY VASQUEZ, JOSE ON 09/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3838255 RECEIVED ON 09/25/2019 09:19:30 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VASQUEZ, JOSE ON 08/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VASQUEZ, JOSE ON 08/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2825698 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2019 12:48:48 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/15/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 07/18/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12589395 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12413434.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VASQUEZ, JOSE ON 07/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VASQUEZ, JOSE ON 07/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY VASQUEZ, JOSE ON 07/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4991788 RECEIVED ON 07/18/2019 09:27:12 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cadence Aerospace LLC is a litigant