This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/29/2022 at 11:49:47 (UTC).

JOSE ORLANDO MARQUEZ VS. GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 JOSE ORLANDO MARQUEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Orlando Marquez

Defendant

General Motors, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Strategic Legal Practices, A Professional Corporation

Defendant Attorney

The Erskine Law Group, PC.

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/03/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/03/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13082636 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12910625.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13082636 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12910625.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARQUEZ, JOSE ORLANDO ON 07/26/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARQUEZ, JOSE ORLANDO ON 07/26/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARQUEZ, JOSE ORLANDO ON 07/26/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARQUEZ, JOSE ORLANDO ON 07/26/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY MARQUEZ, JOSE ORLANDO ON 07/26/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY MARQUEZ, JOSE ORLANDO ON 07/26/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MARQUEZ, JOSE ORLANDO ON 08/25/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MARQUEZ, JOSE ORLANDO ON 08/25/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13107398 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12935400.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13107398 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12935400.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GENERAL MOTORS, LLC ON 09/14/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GENERAL MOTORS, LLC ON 09/14/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: CRANDALL; Department: C33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41384905 RECEIVED ON 09/14/2022 01:48:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13107398 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12935400.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GENERAL MOTORS, LLC ON 09/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41376854 RECEIVED ON 08/25/2022 02:00:46 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MARQUEZ, JOSE ORLANDO ON 08/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21188329 RECEIVED ON 07/26/2022 02:58:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MARQUEZ, JOSE ORLANDO ON 07/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARQUEZ, JOSE ORLANDO ON 07/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARQUEZ, JOSE ORLANDO ON 07/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13082636 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12910625.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 07/26/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/03/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant