This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:46:59 (UTC).

JOSE MEDINA VS. ASHLEY AILEEN WIGGINS

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 JOSE MEDINA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ASHLEY AILEEN WIGGINS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSE MEDINA

Defendant

ASHLEY AILEEN WIGGINS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KRISHNA GULAYA

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MEDINA, JOSE ON 05/27/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MEDINA, JOSE ON 05/27/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MEDINA, JOSE ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MEDINA, JOSE ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MEDINA, JOSE ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MEDINA, JOSE ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY MEDINA, JOSE ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY MEDINA, JOSE ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927753 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751978.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927753 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751978.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MEDINA, JOSE ON 05/27/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1324708 RECEIVED ON 05/27/2016 03:29:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927753 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751978.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MEDINA, JOSE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MEDINA, JOSE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MEDINA, JOSE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385272 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 01:26:47 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.