This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:20:57 (UTC).

JOSE MARTINEZ VS KIUSBA JIMENEZ

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 JOSE MARTINEZ filed a Family - Marriage Annulment lawsuit against KIUSBA JIMENEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1703

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Annulment

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARTINEZ, JOSE ANTONIO

Respondent

JIMENEZ, KIUSBA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2016
  • STIPULATION - COURT APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE 10/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • JUDGMENT - NULLITY 10/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • DECLARATION 10/14/2016; Filing Party: MARTINEZ, JOSE ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 10/14/2016; Filing Party: MARTINEZ, JOSE ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • MINUTE ORDER 10/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • HEARING - NULLITY - UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • RETURNED MAIL 08/09/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • MEMORANDUM - SET HEARING 07/29/2016; Filing Party: MARTINEZ, JOSE ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 07/27/2016; Filing Party: MARTINEZ, JOSE ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 07/27/2016; Filing Party: MARTINEZ, JOSE ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 07/27/2016; Filing Party: MARTINEZ, JOSE ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/27/2016; Filing Party: MARTINEZ, JOSE ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY JUDICIAL OFFICER 03/01/2016; Filing Party: MARTINEZ, JOSE ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 02/26/2016 5C SENT TO DUTY L60; Filing Party: MARTINEZ, JOSE ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MARTINEZ, JOSE ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MARTINEZ, JOSE ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - NULLITY 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: MARTINEZ, JOSE ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.