This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/01/2022 at 06:41:24 (UTC).

JOSE ESCOTO VS. VPM MANAGEMENT, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 JOSE ESCOTO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against VPM MANAGEMENT, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Escoto

Defendant

VPM MANAGEMENT, INC.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Solouki & Savoy, LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY ESCOTO, JOSE ON 11/19/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY ESCOTO, JOSE ON 11/19/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ESCOTO, JOSE ON 11/19/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ESCOTO, JOSE ON 11/19/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ESCOTO, JOSE ON 11/19/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ESCOTO, JOSE ON 11/19/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12974930 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12802847.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12974930 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12802847.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/06/2022 10:57:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/06/2022 10:57:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • HearingDescription: STATUS CONFERENCE; Judge: WILSON; Department: CX102

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/06/2022 10:57:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketTHE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 04/15/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX102.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/15/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12974930 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12802847.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1920588 RECEIVED ON 11/19/2021 04:45:46 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILSON, PETER ON 11/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ESCOTO, JOSE ON 11/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ESCOTO, JOSE ON 11/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ESCOTO, JOSE ON 11/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VPM MANAGEMENT, INC is a litigant