This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/16/2021 at 23:36:20 (UTC).

JOSE CHAVEZ VS. FIDELITY FUNDING

Case Summary

On 07/13/2020 JOSE CHAVEZ filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against FIDELITY FUNDING. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Chavez

Defendants

KG Legal Group

Prestige Escrow

Upper Case Construction

REO Group

Fidelity Funding

Anna Marie Lizarraga

Dolores Writ

Conrad Morales

C&H Services

The REO Group, Inc.

C&H Trust Deed Service

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CDLG, PC

Defendant Attorney

Halavais & Associates, APC

 

Court Documents

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2961901 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2961901 REJECTED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OC GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/30/2020 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/30/2020 09:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12814304 IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. FEE TAKEN IN ERROR

PAYMENT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12814304 IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. FEE TAKEN IN ERROR

DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE SUBMITTED BY CHAVEZ, JOSE REJECTED ON 12/01/2020.

DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE SUBMITTED BY CHAVEZ, JOSE REJECTED ON 12/01/2020.

DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE SUBMITTED BY CHAVEZ, JOSE REJECTED ON 12/01/2020.

DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE SUBMITTED BY CHAVEZ, JOSE REJECTED ON 12/01/2020.

DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE SUBMITTED BY CHAVEZ, JOSE REJECTED ON 12/01/2020.

DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE SUBMITTED BY CHAVEZ, JOSE REJECTED ON 12/01/2020.

DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE SUBMITTED BY CHAVEZ, JOSE REJECTED ON 12/01/2020.

DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE SUBMITTED BY CHAVEZ, JOSE REJECTED ON 12/01/2020.

NOTICE - OTHER SUBMITTED BY CHAVEZ, JOSE REJECTED ON 12/01/2020.

NOTICE - OTHER SUBMITTED BY CHAVEZ, JOSE REJECTED ON 12/01/2020.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER SUBMITTED BY CHAVEZ, JOSE REJECTED ON 12/01/2020.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER SUBMITTED BY CHAVEZ, JOSE REJECTED ON 12/01/2020.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2962327 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2962327 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12814304 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12641422.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12814304 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12641422.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/01/2020

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/01/2020

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 10/26/2020 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 10/26/2020 09:00:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY CHAVEZ, JOSE ON 10/21/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY CHAVEZ, JOSE ON 10/21/2020

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2961901 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/30/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12814304 IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. FEE TAKEN IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE SUBMITTED BY CHAVEZ, JOSE REJECTED ON 12/01/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE SUBMITTED BY CHAVEZ, JOSE REJECTED ON 12/01/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE SUBMITTED BY CHAVEZ, JOSE REJECTED ON 12/01/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE SUBMITTED BY CHAVEZ, JOSE REJECTED ON 12/01/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER SUBMITTED BY CHAVEZ, JOSE REJECTED ON 12/01/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY CHAVEZ, JOSE ON 08/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY CHAVEZ, JOSE ON 08/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1759174 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2020 10:02:30 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41101032 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12758735 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12585114.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2922799 RECEIVED ON 07/13/2020 04:59:47 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 07/13/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHAVEZ, JOSE ON 07/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY CHAVEZ, JOSE ON 07/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIDELITY FUNDING CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where REO GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where C & H TRUST DEED SERVICE is a litigant