This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/05/2021 at 06:53:57 (UTC).

JORGE OCHOA VS. ADRIANA URREA

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 JORGE OCHOA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ADRIANA URREA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jorge Ochoa

Defendant

Adriana Urrea

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olga N. Troshchiy

Defendant Attorney

Resnick & Louis, P.C.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY OCHOA, JORGE ON 08/23/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY OCHOA, JORGE ON 08/23/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY OCHOA, JORGE ON 08/23/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY OCHOA, JORGE ON 08/23/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OCHOA, JORGE ON 08/23/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OCHOA, JORGE ON 08/23/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12933654 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12761553.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12933654 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12761553.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/03/2022 AT 08:45:00 AM IN N15 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/03/2022 AT 08:45:00 AM IN N15 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/14/2021 03:04:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/14/2021 03:04:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY URREA, ADRIANA ON 10/25/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY URREA, ADRIANA ON 10/25/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY URREA, ADRIANA ON 10/25/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY URREA, ADRIANA ON 10/25/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12962110 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12790033.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12962110 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12790033.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SLAUGHTER; Department: N15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12962110 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12790033.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31078336 RECEIVED ON 10/25/2021 05:12:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY URREA, ADRIANA ON 10/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY URREA, ADRIANA ON 10/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/14/2021 03:04:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketTHE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SET ON 02/03/2022 IS ORDERED ADVANCED TO 02/02/2022 AT 02:00 PM IN N15.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/02/2022 AT 02:00:00 PM IN N15 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/03/2022 AT 08:45:00 AM IN N15 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SLAUGHTER, FRED ON 08/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12933654 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12761553.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OCHOA, JORGE ON 08/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY OCHOA, JORGE ON 08/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY OCHOA, JORGE ON 08/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21056280 RECEIVED ON 08/21/2021 03:21:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TROSHCHIY OLGA N.