This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/28/2022 at 20:04:50 (UTC).

JORGE ALFREDO SOTO VS. WALMART, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 JORGE ALFREDO SOTO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WALMART, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JORGE ALFREDO SOTO

Defendant

WALMART, INC., A DELAWARE CO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • HearingDescription: SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Department: C04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 11/14/2022 08:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL CONTINUED TO 12/19/2022 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT C4 PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY SOTO, JORGE ALFREDO ON 09/30/2022; Filing Party: SOTO, JORGE ALFREDO ON 09/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketSOTO, JORGE ALFREDO REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 09/16/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/14/2022 AT 08:00:00 AM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY SOTO, JORGE ALFREDO ON 09/15/2022; Filing Party: SOT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR INTERPRETER (CIVIL) FILED BY SOTO, JORGE ALFREDO ON 09/15/2022; Filing Party: SOTO, JORGE ALFREDO ON 09/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY SOTO, JORGE ALFREDO ON 09/15/2022; Filing Party: SOTO, JORGE ALFREDO ON 09/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT (COVID-19 RENTAL DEBT) FILED BY SOTO, JORGE ALFREDO ON 09/15/2022; Filing Party: SOTO, JORGE ALFREDO ON 09/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant