This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 20:06:56 (UTC).

JONNIE DEMMER VS. PARK NEWPORT LP

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 JONNIE DEMMER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PARK NEWPORT LP. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONNIE DEMMER

Defendant

PARK NEWPORT LP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 01/31/2022 08:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketRETURNED CHECK NOTICE MAILED BY FISCAL SERVICES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12982743 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00 VOIDED DUE TO METHOD OF PAYMENT CHANGED. NSF PROCESSED FN 21-1217 DATED 12/15/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12982743 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00 VOIDED DUE TO METHOD OF PAYMENT CHANGED. NSF PROCESSED FN 21-1217 DATED 12/15/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DEMMER, JONNIE FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12982743 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12810664.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 01/31/2022 AT 08:00:00 AM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY DEMMER, JONNIE ON 12/06/2021; Filing Party: DEMMER, JONNIE ON 12/06/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less