This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:30:10 (UTC).

JONATHAN TURNBULL VS. MICHAEL FRITZ

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 JONATHAN TURNBULL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MICHAEL FRITZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JONATHAN TURNBULL

JONATHA TURNBULL

Defendants

MICHAEL FRITZ JR

MICHAEL FRITZ SR

MICHAEL FRITZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12260863 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12084563.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12260863 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12084563.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233343 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057023.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233343 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057023.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHAN ON 11/15/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHAN ON 11/15/2017

WRIT (ISSUED 11/30/2017) RECEIVED ON 11/29/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED 11/30/2017) RECEIVED ON 11/29/2017.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHAN ON 11/29/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHAN ON 11/29/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHA ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHA ON 10/10/2017

ORDER - OTHER (TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHA ON 10/25/2017

ORDER - OTHER (TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHA ON 10/25/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHAN ON 11/29/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHAN ON 11/29/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHAN ON 11/29/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHAN ON 11/29/2017

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/23/2017.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/23/2017.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHAN ON 11/15/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHAN ON 11/15/2017

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER (CCP 1169) FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHAN ON 11/29/2017

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER (CCP 1169) FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHAN ON 11/29/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHAN ON 12/27/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHAN ON 12/27/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT) FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHAN ON 11/29/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT) FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHAN ON 11/29/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHA ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHA ON 10/10/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12242275 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12065993.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12242275 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12065993.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 11/30/2017) RECEIVED ON 11/29/2017.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 11/30/2017) RECEIVED ON 11/29/2017.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHAN ON 12/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12260863 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12084563.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 11/30/2017) RECEIVED ON 11/29/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHAN ON 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 11/30/2017) RECEIVED ON 11/29/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT - OTHER (CCP 1169) FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHAN ON 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHAN ON 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHAN ON 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER (TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHA ON 10/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12242275 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12065993.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/23/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2605185 RECEIVED ON 10/23/2017 01:09:37 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233343 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057023.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY TURNBULL, JONATHA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4775654 RECEIVED ON 10/09/2017 12:54:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.