This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:48:05 (UTC).

JONATHAN KAVANAGH VS. D&T GLOBAL COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 JONATHAN KAVANAGH filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against D T GLOBAL COMMUNICATIONS, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JONATHAN KAVANAGH

RASOOL FALLAHIARDEKANI

Defendants

THUY THI THU HO

D&T GLOBAL COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

TAI ANH HO

TUU THI HO

DALE LYNN MORTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT WILLIAM SKRIPKO JR

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ANDREW D. WEISS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN ON 10/06/2016

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN ON 10/06/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3461738 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3461738 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3461734 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3461734 REJECTED.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN ON 08/05/2016

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN ON 08/05/2016

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN ON 03/10/2017

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN ON 03/10/2017

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN ON 07/07/2017

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN ON 07/07/2017

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (FORM INTERROGATORIES-GENERAL SET ONE) FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN ON 09/26/2016

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (FORM INTERROGATORIES-GENERAL SET ONE) FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN ON 09/26/2016

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (FORM INTERROGATORIES SET ONE) FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN ON 09/26/2016

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (FORM INTERROGATORIES SET ONE) FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN ON 09/26/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 10/21/2016 10:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 10/21/2016 10:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/25/2016 10:58:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/25/2016 10:58:00 AM.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/26/2018

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/26/2018

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/03/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/03/2017

OPPOSITION FILED BY D&T GLOBAL COMMUNICATIONS, INC.; MORTON, DALE LYNN; HO, TUU THI ON 04/03/2017

OPPOSITION FILED BY D&T GLOBAL COMMUNICATIONS, INC.; MORTON, DALE LYNN; HO, TUU THI ON 04/03/2017

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN ON 10/06/2016

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN ON 10/06/2016

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN ON 08/01/2016

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN ON 08/01/2016

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY D&T GLOBAL COMMUNICATIONS, INC.; MORTON, DALE LYNN; HO, TUU THI ON 10/11/2017

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY D&T GLOBAL COMMUNICATIONS, INC.; MORTON, DALE LYNN; HO, TUU THI ON 10/11/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 12/05/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 12/05/2016 09:00:00 AM.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN ON 02/26/2016

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT (THIRD) FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN; FALLAHIARDEKANI, RASOOL ON 04/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2656062 RECEIVED ON 04/02/2018 06:55:12 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN ON 04/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1484364 RECEIVED ON 04/02/2018 07:24:02 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1484359 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12322646 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12146418.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER (FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN ON 03/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4828839 RECEIVED ON 03/26/2018 01:02:24 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3650090 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
143 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2016
  • THE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 05/09/2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX105.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • THE COURT DEEMS THIS CASE EXCEPTIONAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/09/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX105 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER COLAW, THIERRY ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928474 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752692.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • SURETY NOT IN GOOD STANDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY KAVANAGH, JONATHAN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446793 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 03:33:33 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.