This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/08/2023 at 03:47:21 (UTC).

JOHNNY ZEGARRA VS. GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 JOHNNY ZEGARRA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Johnny Zegarra

Defendant

General Motors LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Kaufman & Associates, Inc.

Defendant Attorney

Erskine Law Group, PC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY ZEGARRA, JOHNNY ON 02/23/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY ZEGARRA, JOHNNY ON 02/23/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ZEGARRA, JOHNNY ON 02/23/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ZEGARRA, JOHNNY ON 02/23/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ZEGARRA, JOHNNY ON 02/23/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ZEGARRA, JOHNNY ON 02/23/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13183075 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13011202.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13183075 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13011202.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/25/2023 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/25/2023 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY ZEGARRA, JOHNNY ON 03/06/2023

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY ZEGARRA, JOHNNY ON 03/06/2023

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GENERAL MOTORS LLC ON 04/04/2023

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GENERAL MOTORS LLC ON 04/04/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13210318 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13038440.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13210318 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13038440.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: LEE; Department: W15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13210318 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13038440.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41470381 RECEIVED ON 04/04/2023 03:26:56 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GENERAL MOTORS LLC ON 04/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY ZEGARRA, JOHNNY ON 03/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11110319 RECEIVED ON 03/06/2023 01:40:09 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/25/2023 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEE, RICHARD ON 02/23/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13183075 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13011202.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ZEGARRA, JOHNNY ON 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ZEGARRA, JOHNNY ON 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ZEGARRA, JOHNNY ON 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11105608 RECEIVED ON 02/23/2023 10:48:10 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less