This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/09/2019 at 03:06:32 (UTC).

JOHNNY HYLDMAR VS. TAYLOR WOODROW HOMES, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/02/2013 JOHNNY HYLDMAR filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against TAYLOR WOODROW HOMES, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNNY HYLDMAR

Defendants and Cross Defendants

TAYLOR WOODROW HOMES, INC.

TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO TAYLOR WOODROW HOMES, INC.

Cross Defendants, Others and Defendants

RII PLASTERING, INC.

WEST COAST DRYWALL, INC.

OAK LEAF LANDSCAPE, INC.

VIKING PLUMBING, INC.

SIERRA PACIFIC WINDOWS, A DIVISION OF SIERRA PACIFIC INDUSTRIES

J GINGER MASONARY, L.P.

HARTMARK DESIGN & MANUFACTURING, INC.

FENCEWORKS, INC.

DOOR SALES INCORPORATED

EXCLUSIVE TILE & MARBLE INSTALLATIONS, INC.

MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

SUNBELT TILE, INC.

JOHN L. GINGER

TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO TAYLOR WOODROW HOMES, INC.

DELTA GRADING, INC.

PETERSON BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION, INC.

DRI RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION

COAST FRAMING, INC.

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLAYTON M. ANDERSON & ASSOCIATES

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Other Attorneys

ULICH, GANION, BALMUTH, FISHER & FELD LLP

STUTZ ARTIANO SHINOFF & HOLTZ

WOLFE & WYMAN LLP

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

DUN & MARTINEK LLP

KIRWIN BECKER LAW GROUP, LLP

MCCATHERN LLP

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN

FREDRICKSON, MAZEIKA & GRANT, LLP

KOLETSKY, MANCINI, FELDMAN & MORROW

HINES HAMPTON

MURCHISON & CUMMING, LLP

Other Attorneys

LIEDLE, LOUNSBERY, LARSON & LIDL, LLP

BROWN, BONN & FRIEDMAN, LLP

LAW OFFICE OF KEVIN PEGAN

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 10/14/2015 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 10/14/2015 10:00:00 AM.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PREFERRED COATINGS, INC.; HARTMARK DESIGN & MANUFACTURING, INC. ON 10/13/2015

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PREFERRED COATINGS, INC.; HARTMARK DESIGN & MANUFACTURING, INC. ON 10/13/2015

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PREFERRED COATINGS, INC.; HARTMARK DESIGN & MANUFACTURING, INC. ON 10/13/2015

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PREFERRED COATINGS, INC.; HARTMARK DESIGN & MANUFACTURING, INC. ON 10/13/2015

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO TAYLOR WOODROW HOMES, INC. ON 10/07/2015

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO TAYLOR WOODROW HOMES, INC. ON 10/07/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY TAYLOR WOODROW HOMES, INC.; TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO TAYLOR WOODROW HOMES, INC. ON 10/06/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY TAYLOR WOODROW HOMES, INC.; TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO TAYLOR WOODROW HOMES, INC. ON 10/06/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO TAYLOR WOODROW HOMES, INC. ON 09/09/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO TAYLOR WOODROW HOMES, INC. ON 09/09/2015

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY WEST COAST DRYWALL, INC. ON 09/08/2015

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY WEST COAST DRYWALL, INC. ON 09/08/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO TAYLOR WOODROW HOMES, INC. ON 08/21/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO TAYLOR WOODROW HOMES, INC. ON 08/21/2015

ORDER - OTHER (GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) FILED BY WEST COAST DRYWALL, INC. ON 08/19/2015

ORDER - OTHER (GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) FILED BY WEST COAST DRYWALL, INC. ON 08/19/2015

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO TAYLOR WOODROW HOMES, INC. ON 08/12/2015

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO TAYLOR WOODROW HOMES, INC. ON 08/12/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC ON 08/12/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC ON 08/12/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC ON 08/12/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC ON 08/12/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC ON 08/11/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC ON 08/11/2015

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: DISMISSAL) FILED BY TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO TAYLOR WOODROW HOMES, INC. ON 08/06/2015

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: DISMISSAL) FILED BY TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO TAYLOR WOODROW HOMES, INC. ON 08/06/2015

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 08/05/2015 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 08/05/2015 10:00:00 AM.

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO TAYLOR WOODROW HOMES, INC. ON 07/31/2015

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO TAYLOR WOODROW HOMES, INC. ON 07/31/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC ON 07/28/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY TAYLOR MORRISON OF CALIFORNIA, LLC ON 07/28/2015

ORDER - OTHER (APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) FILED BY HARTMARK DESIGN & MANUFACTURING, INC. ON 07/24/2015

ORDER - OTHER (APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) FILED BY HARTMARK DESIGN & MANUFACTURING, INC. ON 07/24/2015

187 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 10/14/2015 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PREFERRED COATINGS, INC.; HARTMARK DESIGN & MANUFACTURING, INC. ON 10/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
319 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/21/2013 01:55:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • THE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 09/04/2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT CXC 104.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/04/2013 AT 10:00:00 AM IN CX104 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DUNNING, KIM ON 05/02/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11364748 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11188640.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HYLDMAR, JOHNNY ON 05/02/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HYLDMAR, JOHNNY ON 05/02/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY HYLDMAR, JOHNNY ON 05/02/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 418358 RECEIVED ON 05/02/2013 02:27:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COAST FRAMING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where DRI RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where DELTA GRADING COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where VIKING PLUMBING INC is a litigant