Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 10:23:53 (UTC).

JOHN TREJO VS. CITY OF LA HABRA

Case Summary

On 11/07/2018 JOHN TREJO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LA HABRA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN TREJO

Defendants

SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORP.

CITY OF LA HABRA

SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NASSAR LAW PLLC

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A. HAUSER

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/20/2019 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/20/2019 08:30:00 AM.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA; SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 03/08/2019

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA; SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 03/08/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA; SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 03/08/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA; SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 03/08/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12512372 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12336096.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12512372 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12336096.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY TREJO, JOHN ON 02/27/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY TREJO, JOHN ON 02/27/2019

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY TREJO, JOHN ON 02/27/2019

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY TREJO, JOHN ON 02/27/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TREJO, JOHN ON 02/27/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TREJO, JOHN ON 02/27/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA ON 01/15/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA ON 01/15/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12475777 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12299456.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12475777 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12299456.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 12/19/2018

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 12/19/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TREJO, JOHN ON 12/17/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TREJO, JOHN ON 12/17/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/20/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/20/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TREJO, JOHN ON 11/08/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TREJO, JOHN ON 11/08/2018

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 11/07/2018.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 11/07/2018.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12450096 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12273795.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12450096 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12273795.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TREJO, JOHN ON 11/07/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TREJO, JOHN ON 11/07/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TREJO, JOHN ON 11/07/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TREJO, JOHN ON 11/07/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY TREJO, JOHN ON 11/07/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY TREJO, JOHN ON 11/07/2018

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/20/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 10/18/2019 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • THE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/18/2019 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/18/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/18/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA; SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 03/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA; SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION ON 03/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3767836 RECEIVED ON 03/08/2019 02:14:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12512372 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12336096.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY TREJO, JOHN ON 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3740218 RECEIVED ON 12/17/2018 11:01:13 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/20/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TREJO, JOHN ON 11/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4906243 RECEIVED ON 11/08/2018 03:46:37 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 11/07/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12450096 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12273795.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TREJO, JOHN ON 11/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TREJO, JOHN ON 11/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY TREJO, JOHN ON 11/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2730714 RECEIVED ON 11/07/2018 09:32:15 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION is a litigant