This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:21:22 (UTC).

JOHN MICHAEL HILTON VS. MANUEL RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 JOHN MICHAEL HILTON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MANUEL RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN MICHAEL HILTON

Defendants

MANUEL RAMIREZ

SANTA SANTANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF GARY J GOUGH

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

WRIT (ISSUED 6/21/16) RECEIVED ON 06/20/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 6/21/16) RECEIVED ON 06/20/2016.

COMPLAINT FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 08/12/2013

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 08/16/2016

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 08/16/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 01/21/2014

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 01/21/2014

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 09/04/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 09/04/2013

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 01/21/2014

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 01/21/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 04/30/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 04/30/2015

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 08/12/2013

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/05/13) RECEIVED ON 09/04/2013.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/05/13) RECEIVED ON 09/04/2013.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11449578 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11273470.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11449578 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11273470.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 09/04/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 09/04/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 08/12/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11987118 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11811203.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11987118 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11811203.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/05/13) RECEIVED ON 09/04/2013.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/05/13) RECEIVED ON 09/04/2013.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 11/03/2015

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 11/03/2015

WRIT (ISSUED 05/06/15) RECEIVED ON 04/30/2015.

WRIT (ISSUED 05/06/15) RECEIVED ON 04/30/2015.

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 08/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11987118 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11811203.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 06/20/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 6/21/16) RECEIVED ON 06/20/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3426425 RECEIVED ON 06/20/2016 11:56:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 11/03/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11780107 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11604390.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 04/30/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 05/06/15) RECEIVED ON 04/30/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3283885 RECEIVED ON 04/30/2015 03:17:47 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 09/04/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 09/04/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 09/04/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2276635 RECEIVED ON 09/04/2013 01:56:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY HILTON, JOHN MICHAEL ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2270552 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 10:11:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less