This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 03:29:39 (UTC).

JOHN MARTINEZ VS. BRAIDY FERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 JOHN MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRAIDY FERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Martinez

Defendants

AECOM Technology

Braidy Fernandez

AECOM Technical Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Silberman & Lam

Defendant Attorney

Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY MARTINEZ, JOHN ON 07/27/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY MARTINEZ, JOHN ON 07/27/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARTINEZ, JOHN ON 07/27/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARTINEZ, JOHN ON 07/27/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARTINEZ, JOHN ON 07/27/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARTINEZ, JOHN ON 07/27/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12762696 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12589133.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12762696 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12589133.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 07/27/2020.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 07/27/2020.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MARTINEZ, JOHN ON 08/18/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MARTINEZ, JOHN ON 08/18/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MARTINEZ, JOHN ON 08/18/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MARTINEZ, JOHN ON 08/18/2020

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/05/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/05/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/10/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/10/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC. ON 09/10/2020

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC. ON 09/10/2020

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC. ON 09/10/2020

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC. ON 09/10/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12780536 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12607255.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12780536 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12607255.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FERNANDEZ, BRAIDY ON 09/11/2020

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FERNANDEZ, BRAIDY ON 09/11/2020

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY FERNANDEZ, BRAIDY ON 09/11/2020

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY FERNANDEZ, BRAIDY ON 09/11/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12780937 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12607656.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12780937 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12607656.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • HearingDescription: COURT TRIAL; Judge: HOWARD; Department: C18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • HearingDescription: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HOWARD; Department: C18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12780937 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12607656.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3935900 RECEIVED ON 09/11/2020 01:46:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12780536 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12607255.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1767365 RECEIVED ON 09/10/2020 04:12:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY FERNANDEZ, BRAIDY ON 09/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FERNANDEZ, BRAIDY ON 09/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC. ON 09/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC. ON 09/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/05/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MARTINEZ, JOHN ON 08/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MARTINEZ, JOHN ON 08/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1760809 RECEIVED ON 08/18/2020 12:00:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12762696 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12589133.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41100805 RECEIVED ON 07/27/2020 10:09:40 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 07/27/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARTINEZ, JOHN ON 07/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARTINEZ, JOHN ON 07/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MARTINEZ, JOHN ON 07/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AECOM TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where EARTH TECH (DE), LLC is a litigant