This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:50:01 (UTC).

JOHN DOE VS. KAMALA HARRIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 JOHN DOE filed an Other lawsuit against KAMALA HARRIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN DOE

Defendants

KAMALA HARRIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

IRVINE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JANICE M. BELLUCCI

Defendant Attorneys

DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL

MCCUNE & HARBER, LLP

 

Court Documents

REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY KAMALA HARRIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 05/19/2016

REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY KAMALA HARRIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 05/19/2016

JOINT STATEMENT FILED BY KAMALA HARRIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 06/08/2016

JOINT STATEMENT FILED BY KAMALA HARRIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 06/08/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY IRVINE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 05/23/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY IRVINE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 05/23/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/22/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/22/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY KAMALA HARRIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 07/22/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY KAMALA HARRIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 07/22/2016

ORDER - OTHER (SUSTAINING DEMURRER) FILED BY KAMALA HARRIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 08/01/2016

ORDER - OTHER (SUSTAINING DEMURRER) FILED BY KAMALA HARRIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 08/01/2016

NOTICE OF RECLASSIFICATION

NOTICE OF RECLASSIFICATION

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY KAMALA HARRIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 04/01/2016

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY KAMALA HARRIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 04/01/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/25/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/25/2016

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY IRVINE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 04/13/2016

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY IRVINE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 04/13/2016

AMENDED NOTICE OF RECLASSIFICATION

AMENDED NOTICE OF RECLASSIFICATION

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DOE, JOHN ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DOE, JOHN ON 02/26/2016

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY IRVINE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 07/25/2016

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY IRVINE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 07/25/2016

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/22/2016

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/22/2016

STIPULATION AND ORDER (CONTINUING DEMURRER HEARINGS) FILED BY KAMALA HARRIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 06/03/2016

STIPULATION AND ORDER (CONTINUING DEMURRER HEARINGS) FILED BY KAMALA HARRIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 06/03/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2454795 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2454795 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927747 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751972.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927747 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751972.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DOE, JOHN ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DOE, JOHN ON 02/26/2016

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY DOE, JOHN ON 09/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3458503 RECEIVED ON 09/16/2016 05:41:59 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3456547 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY KAMALA HARRIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 08/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3442155 RECEIVED ON 08/03/2016 02:00:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER (SUSTAINING DEMURRER) FILED BY KAMALA HARRIS, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 08/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1334392 RECEIVED ON 07/25/2016 02:13:29 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER FILED BY IRVINE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 07/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1308177 RECEIVED ON 03/03/2016 05:23:22 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DOE, JOHN ON 03/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DOE, JOHN ON 03/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2448300 RECEIVED ON 03/03/2016 04:07:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927747 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751972.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DOE, JOHN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DOE, JOHN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY DOE, JOHN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509688 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 01:51:46 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.