This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/19/2023 at 03:45:28 (UTC).

JOHN DOE OG 1873 VS. DOE 1

Case Summary

On 12/07/2022 JOHN DOE OG 1873 filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOE 1. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Doe OG 1873

Defendants

Doe 1

Doe 2

Doe 3

Order of Friar Servants of Mary, USA Province

Servite High School, Anaheim, CA

The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFF ANDERSON & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 02/02/2023

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 02/02/2023

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 02/02/2023

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 02/02/2023

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 01/11/2023

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 01/11/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 12/28/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 12/28/2022

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 12/21/2022

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 12/21/2022

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/19/2022

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/19/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 12/19/2022 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 12/19/2022 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 12/14/2022 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 12/14/2022 01:30:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13149692 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12977789.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13149692 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12977789.

APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 12/12/2022

APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 12/12/2022

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 12/12/2022

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 12/12/2022

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 12/12/2022

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 12/12/2022

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 12/12/2022

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 12/12/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/12/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/12/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/16/2024 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/16/2024 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13149202 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12977299.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13149202 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12977299.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 12/07/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 12/07/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 12/07/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 12/07/2022

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2024
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: LEE; Department: W15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 02/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21267567 RECEIVED ON 02/02/2023 04:02:17 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 02/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41443255 RECEIVED ON 02/02/2023 04:02:17 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 01/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41433517 RECEIVED ON 01/11/2023 02:22:14 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21252485 RECEIVED ON 12/28/2022 02:32:57 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 12/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41425734 RECEIVED ON 12/21/2022 09:00:31 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 12/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21246376 RECEIVED ON 12/12/2022 03:59:01 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/16/2024 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13149202 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12977299.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41419900 RECEIVED ON 12/07/2022 09:58:56 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEE, RICHARD ON 12/07/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 12/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 12/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY OG 1873, JOHN DOE ON 12/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less