This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/17/2023 at 03:47:15 (UTC).

JOHN DOE OG 1812 V. DOE 1, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 JOHN DOE OG 1812 filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOE 1,. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Doe OG 1812

Defendants

Doe 1, a Corporation Sole

Doe 2, a California Corporation

Doe 3, a Stock Corporation

Order of Friar Servants of Mary, USA Province

Servite High School, Anaheim, CA

The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFF ANDERSON & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 02/02/2023

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 02/02/2023

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 02/02/2023

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 02/02/2023

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 01/11/2023

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 01/11/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 12/28/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 12/28/2022

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 12/12/2022

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 12/12/2022

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/12/2022

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/12/2022

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 12/12/2022 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 12/12/2022 01:30:00 PM.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 12/09/2022

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 12/09/2022

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 12/09/2022

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 12/09/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 37 - MOTION/NOTICE TO CONTINUE HEARING OR CMC IN THE AMOUNT OF 80.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13148769 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12976866.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 37 - MOTION/NOTICE TO CONTINUE HEARING OR CMC IN THE AMOUNT OF 80.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13148769 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12976866.

APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 12/09/2022

APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 12/09/2022

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 12/09/2022

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 12/09/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/09/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/09/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/12/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/12/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13148420 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12976517.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13148420 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12976517.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 12/05/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 12/05/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 12/05/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 12/05/2022

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SERVINO; Department: C21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 02/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21267559 RECEIVED ON 02/02/2023 03:57:16 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 02/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41443249 RECEIVED ON 02/02/2023 03:57:16 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 01/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31255196 RECEIVED ON 01/11/2023 04:13:32 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11081980 RECEIVED ON 12/28/2022 02:36:26 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 12/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11075173 RECEIVED ON 12/09/2022 03:23:26 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 12/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11074872 RECEIVED ON 12/09/2022 10:14:31 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/12/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13148420 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12976517.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31240391 RECEIVED ON 12/05/2022 10:01:36 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 12/05/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 12/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 12/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY OG 1812, JOHN DOE ON 12/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less