This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/31/2023 at 03:44:46 (UTC).

JOHN DOE OG 1692 VS. DOE 2, A CORPORATION SOLE

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 JOHN DOE OG 1692 filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOE 2, A CORPORATION SOLE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Doe OG 1692

Defendants

Doe 1, a Corporation Sole

Doe 2, a Corporation Sole

Doe 3, a California Corporation

Doe 4, a Stock Corporation

Order of Friar Servants of Mary United States of America Province, Inc., a Stock Corporation

Servite High School, A California Corporation

The Roman Catholic Archbishop of Los Angeles, a Corporation Sole

The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orang a Corporation Sole

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFF ANDERSON & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 01/11/2023

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 01/11/2023

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/13/2022 01:25:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/13/2022 01:25:00 PM.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 12/07/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 12/07/2022

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 12/07/2022

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 12/07/2022

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11072950 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11072950 REJECTED.

ORDER GRANTING (APPLICATION FOR IN CAMERA) FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 12/01/2022

ORDER GRANTING (APPLICATION FOR IN CAMERA) FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 12/01/2022

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41417425 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41417425 REJECTED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 12/01/2022 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 12/01/2022 01:30:00 PM.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/01/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/01/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13143125 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12971219.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13143125 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12971219.

APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW) FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 11/29/2022

APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW) FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 11/29/2022

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 11/29/2022

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 11/29/2022

CERTIFICATE - OTHER (OF MERIT) SUBMITTED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE REJECTED ON 11/29/2022.

CERTIFICATE - OTHER (OF MERIT) SUBMITTED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE REJECTED ON 11/29/2022.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/29/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/29/2022

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 11/29/2022

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 11/29/2022

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 11/29/2022

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 11/29/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 11/23/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 11/23/2022

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HURWITZ; Department: CX103

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 01/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21257986 RECEIVED ON 01/11/2023 04:11:35 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/13/2022 01:25:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketTHE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 03/22/2023 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT CX103.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 12/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 12/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21244218 RECEIVED ON 12/07/2022 09:00:15 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11072950 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41416208 RECEIVED ON 11/29/2022 09:59:21 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 11/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11069999 RECEIVED ON 11/29/2022 09:59:20 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 11/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31236511 RECEIVED ON 11/23/2022 09:36:34 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13141411 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12969505.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31234661 RECEIVED ON 11/18/2022 11:59:43 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HURWITZ, LON ON 11/18/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 11/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY OG 1692, JOHN DOE ON 11/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less