This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/27/2022 at 16:17:00 (UTC).

JOHN DOE 7021 VS. MATER DEI HIGH SCHOOL

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 JOHN DOE 7021 filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MATER DEI HIGH SCHOOL. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Doe 7021

Defendants

Mater Dei High School

The Roman Catholic Diocese of Orange

The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange

Guardian Ad Litem

JOHN 7022 DOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeff Anderson & Associates

Greenberg Gross LLP

John 7022 Doe

Defendant Attorney

Greene & Roberts

 

Court Documents

OPPOSITION FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 02/14/2022

OPPOSITION FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 02/14/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 02/14/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 02/14/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 02/14/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 02/14/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 02/14/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 02/14/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 02/14/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 02/14/2022

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 02/23/2022

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 02/23/2022

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY MATER DEI HIGH SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF ORANGE ON 02/28/2022

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY MATER DEI HIGH SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF ORANGE ON 02/28/2022

SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY MATER DEI HIGH SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF ORANGE ON 02/28/2022

SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY MATER DEI HIGH SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF ORANGE ON 02/28/2022

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY MATER DEI HIGH SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF ORANGE ON 03/03/2022

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY MATER DEI HIGH SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF ORANGE ON 03/03/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/03/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/03/2022

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY MATER DEI HIGH SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF ORANGE ON 03/03/2022

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY MATER DEI HIGH SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF ORANGE ON 03/03/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MATER DEI HIGH SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF ORANGE ON 03/03/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MATER DEI HIGH SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF ORANGE ON 03/03/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13015519 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12843466.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13015519 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12843466.

OPPOSITION FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 03/03/2022

OPPOSITION FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 03/03/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 03/03/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 03/03/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 03/03/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 03/03/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 03/03/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 03/03/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 03/04/2022 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 03/04/2022 08:30:00 AM.

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GRIFFIN; Department: N17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • HearingDescription: MOTION - OTHER; Judge: GRIFFIN; Department: N17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION (ORAL OR WRITTEN); Judge: GRIFFIN; Department: N17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41336086 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER AFTER HEARING (EX-PARTE HEARING) FILED BY THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF ORANGE ON 05/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 05/19/2022 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER DATED 5/19/22 CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 05/19/2022 10:37:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21160564 RECEIVED ON 05/18/2022 10:14:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF ORANGE ON 05/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
140 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 11/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 11/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 11/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED BY DOE 7021, JOHN ON 11/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM RECEIVED ON 11/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 495.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12974637 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12802554.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GRIFFIN, CRAIG ON 11/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 11/24/2021 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/01/2022 AT 09:30:00 AM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF ORANGE is a litigant

Latest cases where THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOOP OF ORANGE is a litigant