This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/24/2022 at 09:04:24 (UTC).

JOHN B. EWLES, INC. VS. MOOREFIELD CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 JOHN B EWLES, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MOOREFIELD CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John B. Ewles, Inc.

Defendants

Evergreen-Limonite & Sumner, LLC

Moorefield Construction, Inc.

Omega Paving, Inc.

Salem Engineering Group, Inc.

Tait and Associates, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Garber, AV & Duncan

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY JOHN B. EWLES, INC. ON 02/07/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY JOHN B. EWLES, INC. ON 02/07/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13004814 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12832766.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13004814 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12832766.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/08/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/08/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21119598 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21119598 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21119683 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21119683 REJECTED.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY JOHN B. EWLES, INC. ON 02/09/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY JOHN B. EWLES, INC. ON 02/09/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SCHWARM; Department: W08

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY JOHN B. EWLES, INC. ON 02/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21120861 RECEIVED ON 02/09/2022 01:08:21 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21119683 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21119598 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/08/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 02/07/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13004814 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12832766.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY JOHN B. EWLES, INC. ON 02/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31117014 RECEIVED ON 02/07/2022 11:18:44 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SALEM ENGINEERING GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where John B. Ewles, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TAIT & ASSOCIATES INC. is a litigant