This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:21:16 (UTC).

JOE MORRISON VS. KIMBERLY KELLY

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 JOE MORRISON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KIMBERLY KELLY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOE MORRISON

Defendant

KIMBERLY KELLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVEN D. SILVERSTEIN

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/14/2013) RECEIVED ON 09/13/2013.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/14/2013) RECEIVED ON 09/13/2013.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11435154 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11259026.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11435154 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11259026.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 08/12/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 09/13/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 09/13/2013

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 10/29/2013

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 10/29/2013

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/18/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C61 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/18/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C61 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

COMPLAINT FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 08/12/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 09/13/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 09/13/2013

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 08/23/2013

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 08/23/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11458655 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11282547.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11458655 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11282547.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 09/13/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 09/13/2013

WRIT (ISSUED ON 9/14/13) RECEIVED ON 09/13/2013.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 9/14/13) RECEIVED ON 09/13/2013.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/14/2013) RECEIVED ON 09/13/2013.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/14/2013) RECEIVED ON 09/13/2013.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 08/19/2013.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 08/19/2013.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 10/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2013
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11458655 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11282547.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 09/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 09/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 9/14/13) RECEIVED ON 09/13/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/14/2013) RECEIVED ON 09/13/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/14/2013) RECEIVED ON 09/13/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 09/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 08/23/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11435154 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11259026.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 08/19/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2272425 RECEIVED ON 08/19/2013 12:51:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MORRISON, JOE ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1105428 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 10:46:24 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less