This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:51:00 (UTC).

JOE JADEED VS. JOHN A. AUBEL

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 JOE JADEED filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOHN A AUBEL. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOE JADEED

JANO JADEED

Defendants

JANINE AUBEL

JOHN A. AUBEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEINREB LAW, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

THE LAW OFFICE OF CLEIDIN Z. ATANOUS

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY JADEED, JANO; JADEED, JOE ON 05/09/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY JADEED, JANO; JADEED, JOE ON 05/09/2017

OPPOSITION FILED BY JADEED, JANO ON 05/25/2016

OPPOSITION FILED BY JADEED, JANO ON 05/25/2016

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY AUBEL, JANINE; AUBEL, JOHN A. ON 06/01/2016

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY AUBEL, JANINE; AUBEL, JOHN A. ON 06/01/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY JADEED, JOE; JADEED, JANO ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY JADEED, JOE; JADEED, JANO ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE), 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,080.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11967784 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11791940.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE), 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,080.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11967784 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11791940.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JADEED, JOE ON 04/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JADEED, JOE ON 04/15/2016

MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY AUBEL, JANINE; AUBEL, JOHN A. ON 05/11/2016

MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY AUBEL, JANINE; AUBEL, JOHN A. ON 05/11/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JADEED, JOE ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JADEED, JOE ON 02/26/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/09/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/09/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AUBEL, JANINE; AUBEL, JOHN A. ON 05/11/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AUBEL, JANINE; AUBEL, JOHN A. ON 05/11/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JADEED, JOE ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JADEED, JOE ON 02/26/2016

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY JADEED, JANO; JADEED, JOE ON 04/13/2017

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY JADEED, JANO; JADEED, JOE ON 04/13/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 04/14/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 04/14/2017 09:00:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JADEED, JOE ON 04/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JADEED, JOE ON 04/15/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JADEED, JANO ON 05/24/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JADEED, JANO ON 05/24/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY JOURNALTECHNOLOGIESINC FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928201 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752426.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY JOURNALTECHNOLOGIESINC FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928201 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752426.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AUBEL, JANINE; AUBEL, JOHN A. ON 05/25/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AUBEL, JANINE; AUBEL, JOHN A. ON 05/25/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/08/2016 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/08/2016 01:30:00 PM.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY JADEED, JANO; JADEED, JOE ON 05/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3543046 RECEIVED ON 05/09/2017 10:20:35 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 04/14/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 06/15/2017 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C31.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 06/15/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY JADEED, JANO; JADEED, JOE ON 04/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1379240 RECEIVED ON 04/13/2017 01:19:42 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT RECEIVED ON 04/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JADEED, JOE ON 04/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JADEED, JOE ON 04/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2455530 RECEIVED ON 04/15/2016 12:48:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/09/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HORN, FREDERICK ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY JOURNALTECHNOLOGIESINC FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928201 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752426.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JADEED, JOE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JADEED, JOE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY JADEED, JOE; JADEED, JANO ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1307083 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 03:28:12 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.