Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/07/2021 at 07:45:51 (UTC).

JIMMY MARTINEZ VS. FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 JIMMY MARTINEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jimmy Martinez

Defendant

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Neale & Fhima, LLP

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MARTINEZ, JIMMY ON 04/19/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MARTINEZ, JIMMY ON 04/19/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/20/2021 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/20/2021 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12872872 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12700551.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12872872 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12700551.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARTINEZ, JIMMY ON 04/13/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARTINEZ, JIMMY ON 04/13/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARTINEZ, JIMMY ON 04/13/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARTINEZ, JIMMY ON 04/13/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MARTINEZ, JIMMY ON 04/13/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MARTINEZ, JIMMY ON 04/13/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: LEWIS; Department: C26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MARTINEZ, JIMMY ON 04/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31005310 RECEIVED ON 04/19/2021 01:39:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/20/2021 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12872872 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12700551.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1834989 RECEIVED ON 04/13/2021 04:09:21 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 04/13/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARTINEZ, JIMMY ON 04/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARTINEZ, JIMMY ON 04/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MARTINEZ, JIMMY ON 04/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant