This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:12:58 (UTC).

JILL MILLIGAN VS. SARAH ROGERS

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 JILL MILLIGAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SARAH ROGERS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JILL MILLIGAN

Defendants

JEANNE ROGERS

SARAH ROGERS

SARAH B. ROGERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER J. GONZALES

LAW OFFICE OF CHAMBERS, NORONHA & KUBOTA

CHAMBERS & KUBOTA

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF MCCARTHY & BEAVERS

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/06/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/06/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/10/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/10/2014 09:00:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MUNOZ, GREGORY ON 08/12/2013.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MUNOZ, GREGORY ON 08/12/2013.

COMPLAINT FILED BY MILLIGAN, JILL ON 08/15/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY MILLIGAN, JILL ON 08/15/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY MILLIGAN, JILL ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY MILLIGAN, JILL ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MILLIGAN, JILL ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MILLIGAN, JILL ON 08/12/2013

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES (& DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL) FILED BY ROGERS, JEANNE; ROGERS, SARAH B. ON 02/11/2014

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES (& DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL) FILED BY ROGERS, JEANNE; ROGERS, SARAH B. ON 02/11/2014

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ROGERS, JEANNE; ROGERS, SARAH B. ON 02/11/2014

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ROGERS, JEANNE; ROGERS, SARAH B. ON 02/11/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431051 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254923.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431051 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254923.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/03/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/03/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY MILLIGAN, JILL ON 10/29/2013

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY MILLIGAN, JILL ON 10/29/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,020.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11543040 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11366885.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,020.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11543040 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11366885.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MILLIGAN, JILL ON 07/03/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MILLIGAN, JILL ON 07/03/2014

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 01/07/2014 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 01/07/2014 08:30:00 AM.

CASE REASSIGNED TO ANDREW BANKS EFFECTIVE 12/16/2013.

CASE REASSIGNED TO ANDREW BANKS EFFECTIVE 12/16/2013.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/03/2013 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/03/2013 08:30:00 AM.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2014
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MILLIGAN, JILL ON 07/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MILLIGAN, JILL ON 07/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3163493 RECEIVED ON 07/03/2014 04:01:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/10/2014 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • THE COURT ORDERS THE COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF JILL MILLIGAN BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • THE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/24/2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/24/2014 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO ANDREW BANKS EFFECTIVE 12/16/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY MILLIGAN, JILL ON 10/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 498695 RECEIVED ON 10/29/2013 10:40:27 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/03/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MUNOZ, GREGORY ON 08/12/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431051 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254923.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MILLIGAN, JILL ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MILLIGAN, JILL ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MILLIGAN, JILL ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 462482 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 02:10:39 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less