This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:49:30 (UTC).

JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC VS. YULYANA LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against YULYANA LOPEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC

Defendant

YULYANA LOPEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

WRIT RECEIVED ON 03/24/2016.

WRIT RECEIVED ON 03/24/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11942076 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11766251.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11942076 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11766251.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY LOPEZ, YULYANA ON 03/03/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY LOPEZ, YULYANA ON 03/03/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC ON 02/26/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC ON 03/24/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC ON 03/24/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY LOPEZ, YULYANA ON 03/03/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY LOPEZ, YULYANA ON 03/03/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC ON 03/04/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC ON 03/04/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

COMPLAINT FILED BY JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC ON 02/26/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC ON 04/25/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC ON 04/25/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC ON 03/28/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC ON 03/28/2016

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/24/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/24/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC ON 03/04/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC ON 03/04/2016

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/24/2016.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/24/2016.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/03/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/03/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

WRIT ISSUED

WRIT ISSUED

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC ON 04/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC ON 03/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11942076 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11766251.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT RECEIVED ON 03/24/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC ON 03/24/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/24/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY LOPEZ, YULYANA ON 03/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • LOPEZ, YULYANA REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 03/03/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY LOPEZ, YULYANA ON 03/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927230 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751455.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY JHC - BUENA PARK, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385206 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 12:07:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less