This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:30:25 (UTC).

JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP VS. IVAN GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against IVAN GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP

Defendants

DENNIS B. LAY

IVAN GONZALEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Other Attorney

GEORGIA N. KEZIOS, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Other Attorneys

GEORGIA N. KEZIOS, A PROFESSIONAL CORP

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/13/17) RECEIVED ON 11/09/2017.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/13/17) RECEIVED ON 11/09/2017.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 10/10/2017

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 01/11/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 01/11/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 11/09/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 11/09/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 11/09/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 11/09/2017

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12251310 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12075030.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12251310 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12075030.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 11/13/17) RECEIVED ON 11/09/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 11/13/17) RECEIVED ON 11/09/2017.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 11/30/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 11/30/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 10/10/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233325 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057005.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233325 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057005.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 11/09/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 11/09/2017

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/13/17) RECEIVED ON 11/09/2017.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/13/17) RECEIVED ON 11/09/2017.

COMPLAINT FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 10/10/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 11/09/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 11/09/2017

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 11/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12251310 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12075030.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 11/13/17) RECEIVED ON 11/09/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/13/17) RECEIVED ON 11/09/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/13/17) RECEIVED ON 11/09/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2611211 RECEIVED ON 11/09/2017 02:26:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 01/11/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233325 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057005.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY JGKALLINS INVESTMENTS LP ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4775736 RECEIVED ON 10/09/2017 04:24:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.