This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/10/2019 at 05:53:54 (UTC).

JENNIFER OWENS VS BRIAN OWENS

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 JENNIFER OWENS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BRIAN OWENS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2571

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

OWENS, JENNIFER A

Respondent

OWENS, BRIAN S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SUTER, ROULA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • STIPULATION & ORDER 02/19/2019 Re: Satisfsction of Spousal Support; Filing Party: OWENS, JENNIFER A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • RETURN SHEET - CLERKS OFFICE 02/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 06/18/2018 Notice of Withdrawal fo Attorney; Filing Party: OWENS, BRIAN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 05/23/2018; Filing Party: OWENS, JENNIFER A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 05/23/2018; Filing Party: OWENS, JENNIFER A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 05/23/2018; Filing Party: OWENS, JENNIFER A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/23/2018; Filing Party: OWENS, JENNIFER A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 05/23/2018; Filing Party: OWENS, JENNIFER A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • CONFERENCE - STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • NOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE - UNASSIGNED 03/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2017
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/25/2017 Preliminary; Filing Party: OWENS, JENNIFER A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/12/2017 Preliminary; Filing Party: OWENS, BRIAN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 08/03/2017; Filing Party: OWENS, JENNIFER A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 08/03/2017; Filing Party: OWENS, JENNIFER A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 07/13/2017; Filing Party: OWENS, BRIAN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 07/13/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: OWENS, BRIAN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL (CIVIL) 07/13/2017; Filing Party: OWENS, BRIAN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 03/29/2017; Filing Party: OWENS, JENNIFER A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • SUMMONS 03/29/2017; Filing Party: OWENS, JENNIFER A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 03/29/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: OWENS, JENNIFER A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUTER ROULA SALEEM