This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:20:48 (UTC).

JENNIFER MCELROY VS CAMERON DIMMICK

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 JENNIFER MCELROY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CAMERON DIMMICK. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1707

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MCELROY, JENNIFER

Respondent

DIMMICK, CAMERON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL 03/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 03/10/2017; Filing Party: MCELROY, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 03/10/2017; Filing Party: MCELROY, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 03/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • STIPULATION - COURT APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE 03/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER 03/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • HEARING - DISSOLUTION - UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • MEMORANDUM - SET HEARING 10/20/2016; Filing Party: MCELROY, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 10/18/2016; Filing Party: MCELROY, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 10/18/2016; Filing Party: MCELROY, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/18/2016; Filing Party: MCELROY, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 10/18/2016; Filing Party: MCELROY, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • NOTICE - CASE REVIEW 08/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • RETURN SHEET - CLERKS OFFICE 06/20/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MCELROY, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MCELROY, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MCELROY, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MCELROY, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MCELROY, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: MCELROY, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.