Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/13/2021 at 06:53:05 (UTC).

JENNIFER MADDOCK VS. AMERICAN ADDICTION CENTERS, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 JENNIFER MADDOCK filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against AMERICAN ADDICTION CENTERS, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Maddock

Defendants

Cherie Sampson

American Addiction Centers, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Employee Justice Legal Group

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF STAY (BANKRUPTCY) FILED BY MADDOCK, JENNIFER ON 12/16/2020

NOTICE OF STAY (BANKRUPTCY) FILED BY MADDOCK, JENNIFER ON 12/16/2020

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3963025 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3963025 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12814362 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12641480.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12814362 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12641480.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MADDOCK, JENNIFER ON 12/01/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MADDOCK, JENNIFER ON 12/01/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MADDOCK, JENNIFER ON 12/01/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MADDOCK, JENNIFER ON 12/01/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY MADDOCK, JENNIFER ON 12/01/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY MADDOCK, JENNIFER ON 12/01/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3964007 RECEIVED ON 12/16/2020 03:49:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF STAY (BANKRUPTCY) FILED BY MADDOCK, JENNIFER ON 12/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3963025 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER ZELTZER, NANCY ON 12/01/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12814362 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12641480.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MADDOCK, JENNIFER ON 12/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MADDOCK, JENNIFER ON 12/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MADDOCK, JENNIFER ON 12/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3959135 RECEIVED ON 12/01/2020 08:54:51 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Addiction Centers, Inc. is a litigant