This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:49:47 (UTC).

JENNIFER KNISLEY VS. UNLEASH SOLAR, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 JENNIFER KNISLEY filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against UNLEASH SOLAR, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENNIFER KNISLEY

Defendant

UNLEASH SOLAR, LLC

Assignee

LABOR COMMISSIONER, STATE OF CALIFORNIA

 

Court Documents

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY LABOR COMMISSIONER, STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 10/05/2016

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY LABOR COMMISSIONER, STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 10/05/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT - LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED BY KNISLEY, JENNIFER ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT - LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED BY KNISLEY, JENNIFER ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KNISLEY, JENNIFER ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KNISLEY, JENNIFER ON 02/26/2016

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY LABOR COMMISSIONER, STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 10/05/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4616163 RECEIVED ON 10/05/2016 02:48:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF LABOR BOARD JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT - LABOR COMMISSIONER DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF LABOR BOARD JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT - LABOR COMMISSIONER FOR KNISLEY, JENNIFER IN THE AMOUNT OF 0.00 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 0.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST UNLEASH SOLAR, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KNISLEY, JENNIFER ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT - LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED BY KNISLEY, JENNIFER ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446570 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 09:47:30 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.