This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2023 at 03:41:50 (UTC).

JENNIFER HODGES VS. BARONHR EAST, INC

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 JENNIFER HODGES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BARONHR EAST, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Hodges

Defendants

Baronhr East, Inc

Baronhr Group, LLC

Baronhr Healthcare, LLC

Baronhr Hospitality, LLC

Baronhr Security, Inc.

Baronhr Security, LLC

Baronhr Technical, LLC

Baronhr West, Inc

Baronhr, Inc

Baronhr, LLC

Lou Perez

Ulises Jaurejui

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MORRIS NAZARIAN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY HODGES, JENNIFER ON 12/27/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY HODGES, JENNIFER ON 12/27/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13157252 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12985349.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13157252 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12985349.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/06/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/06/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY HODGES, JENNIFER ON 01/17/2023

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY HODGES, JENNIFER ON 01/17/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HODGES, JENNIFER ON 01/26/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HODGES, JENNIFER ON 01/26/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HODGES, JENNIFER ON 01/30/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HODGES, JENNIFER ON 01/30/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: CRANDALL; Department: C33

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11095347 RECEIVED ON 01/30/2023 05:26:53 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HODGES, JENNIFER ON 01/30/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31261463 RECEIVED ON 01/26/2023 11:52:12 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HODGES, JENNIFER ON 01/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31257045 RECEIVED ON 01/17/2023 11:05:43 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY HODGES, JENNIFER ON 01/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/06/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13157252 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12985349.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31249305 RECEIVED ON 12/27/2022 04:17:02 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 12/27/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY HODGES, JENNIFER ON 12/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less