This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/29/2021 at 07:36:59 (UTC).

JENNIFER H. RHO VS. THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 JENNIFER H RHO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Janine H. Rho

Jennifer H. Rho

Defendants

Carl Warren & Company, LLC

The Irvine Company LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kimura London & White LLP

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RHO, JANINE H.; RHO, JENNIFER H. ON 08/25/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RHO, JANINE H.; RHO, JENNIFER H. ON 08/25/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RHO, JANINE H.; RHO, JENNIFER H. ON 08/25/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RHO, JANINE H.; RHO, JENNIFER H. ON 08/25/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RHO, JANINE H.; RHO, JENNIFER H. ON 08/06/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RHO, JANINE H.; RHO, JENNIFER H. ON 08/06/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/22/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/22/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12925848 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12753707.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12925848 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12753707.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RHO, JENNIFER H.; RHO, JANINE H. ON 08/05/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RHO, JENNIFER H.; RHO, JANINE H. ON 08/05/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY RHO, JENNIFER H.; RHO, JANINE H. ON 08/05/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY RHO, JENNIFER H.; RHO, JANINE H. ON 08/05/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HOFFER; Department: C42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RHO, JANINE H.; RHO, JENNIFER H. ON 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31054892 RECEIVED ON 08/25/2021 12:43:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RHO, JANINE H.; RHO, JENNIFER H. ON 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21057585 RECEIVED ON 08/25/2021 12:43:38 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RHO, JANINE H.; RHO, JENNIFER H. ON 08/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21050411 RECEIVED ON 08/06/2021 12:24:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/22/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12925848 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12753707.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1879073 RECEIVED ON 08/05/2021 05:30:46 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 08/05/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RHO, JENNIFER H.; RHO, JANINE H. ON 08/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY RHO, JENNIFER H.; RHO, JANINE H. ON 08/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARL WARREN & COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where The Irvine Company, LLC is a litigant