This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:20:17 (UTC).

JENNIFER ENGLISH VS SCOTT ENGLISH

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 JENNIFER ENGLISH filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against SCOTT ENGLISH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1718

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ENGLISH, JENNIFER LYNN

Respondent

ENGLISH, SCOTT ANDREW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2017
  • CONFERENCE - CASE RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • NOTICE - CASE RESOLUTION CONFERENCE - UNASSIGNED 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • NOTICE - CASE REVIEW 08/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 03/01/2016 FW001; Filing Party: ENGLISH, JENNIFER LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 03/01/2016 FW001; Filing Party: ENGLISH, JENNIFER LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY JUDICIAL OFFICER 03/01/2016; Filing Party: ENGLISH, JENNIFER LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 03/01/2016 FW001; Filing Party: ENGLISH, JENNIFER LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 03/01/2016 FW001; Filing Party: ENGLISH, JENNIFER LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016 L1120; Filing Party: ENGLISH, JENNIFER LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016 FL110; Filing Party: ENGLISH, JENNIFER LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 02/26/2016 FL105; Filing Party: ENGLISH, JENNIFER LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - LEGAL SEPARATION 02/26/2016; Filing Party: ENGLISH, JENNIFER LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.