This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/22/2020 at 02:27:15 (UTC).

JENNIFER COX VS. CUTTWOOD, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/02/2016 JENNIFER COX filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CUTTWOOD, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENNIFER COX

Defendants

MOLECULE LABS, INC.

CUTTWOOD, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BISNAR CHASE, LLP

JOSE GARAY, APLC

Defendant Attorneys

KELLER AND HECKMAN, LLP

MARK S. HOFFMAN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Other Attorneys

BEROKIM & DUEL, P.C.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY COX, JENNIFER; COX, JENNIFER ON 03/16/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY COX, JENNIFER; COX, JENNIFER ON 03/16/2017

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (RE: BISNAR CHASE LLP) FILED BY COX, JENNIFER ON 03/08/2017

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (RE: BISNAR CHASE LLP) FILED BY COX, JENNIFER ON 03/08/2017

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (RE: JOSE GARAY) FILED BY COX, JENNIFER ON 03/08/2017

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (RE: JOSE GARAY) FILED BY COX, JENNIFER ON 03/08/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 03/08/2017 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 03/08/2017 01:30:00 PM.

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CUTTWOOD, LLC ON 03/07/2017

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CUTTWOOD, LLC ON 03/07/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY COX, JENNIFER ON 02/01/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY COX, JENNIFER ON 02/01/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 12/14/2016 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 12/14/2016 10:00:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY CUTTWOOD, LLC; MOLECULE LABS, INC. ON 09/21/2016

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY CUTTWOOD, LLC; MOLECULE LABS, INC. ON 09/21/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CUTTWOOD, LLC; MOLECULE LABS, INC. ON 09/21/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CUTTWOOD, LLC; MOLECULE LABS, INC. ON 09/21/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CUTTWOOD, LLC ON 06/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CUTTWOOD, LLC ON 06/15/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/13/2016.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/13/2016.

MOTION TO STRIKE (DISGORGEMENT PRAYER IN COMPLAINT) FILED BY CUTTWOOD, LLC; MOLECULE LABS, INC. ON 05/13/2016

MOTION TO STRIKE (DISGORGEMENT PRAYER IN COMPLAINT) FILED BY CUTTWOOD, LLC; MOLECULE LABS, INC. ON 05/13/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/12/2016 03:36:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/12/2016 03:36:00 PM.

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY COX, JENNIFER ON 03/30/2016

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY COX, JENNIFER ON 03/30/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY COX, JENNIFER ON 03/02/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY COX, JENNIFER ON 03/02/2016

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY COX, JENNIFER; COX, JENNIFER ON 03/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3522818 RECEIVED ON 03/16/2017 01:16:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2017-03-15 10:00:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 03/08/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (RE: BISNAR CHASE LLP) FILED BY COX, JENNIFER ON 03/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (RE: JOSE GARAY) FILED BY COX, JENNIFER ON 03/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
126 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY COX, JENNIFER ON 03/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4525368 RECEIVED ON 03/30/2016 09:00:26 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY COX, JENNIFER ON 03/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4525365 RECEIVED ON 03/30/2016 08:55:04 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11930290 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11754490.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1307836 RECEIVED ON 03/02/2016 02:35:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER ANDLER, GAIL ON 03/02/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY COX, JENNIFER ON 03/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY COX, JENNIFER ON 03/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY COX, JENNIFER ON 03/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CUTTWOOD LLC is a litigant