This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:46:44 (UTC).

JENNIFER ALVARADO VS. IRMA ISLAS

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 JENNIFER ALVARADO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IRMA ISLAS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TULIA ALVARADO

JENNIFER ALVARADO

Defendant

IRMA ISLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KNYPSTRA HERMES, LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY ALVARADO, JENNIFER; ALVARADO, TULIA ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY ALVARADO, JENNIFER; ALVARADO, TULIA ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927612 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751837.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927612 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751837.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/08/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/08/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALVARADO, JENNIFER; ALVARADO, TULIA ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALVARADO, JENNIFER; ALVARADO, TULIA ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALVARADO, JENNIFER; ALVARADO, TULIA ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALVARADO, JENNIFER; ALVARADO, TULIA ON 02/26/2016

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 02/26/2016.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4561248 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4561248 REJECTED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ALVARADO, JENNIFER; ALVARADO, TULIA ON 06/21/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ALVARADO, JENNIFER; ALVARADO, TULIA ON 06/21/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ALVARADO, JENNIFER; ALVARADO, TULIA ON 06/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4565026 RECEIVED ON 06/21/2016 01:54:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4561248 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/08/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927612 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751837.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALVARADO, JENNIFER; ALVARADO, TULIA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALVARADO, JENNIFER; ALVARADO, TULIA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ALVARADO, JENNIFER; ALVARADO, TULIA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385222 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 12:20:02 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.