This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/31/2022 at 03:49:05 (UTC).

JEFFREY SIBLEY VS. SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 JEFFREY SIBLEY filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Don Stoddard

Jeffrey Sibley

Defendants

Edison International

Southern California Edison Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Engstrom, Lipscomb & Lack

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/29/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/29/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13050532 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12878548.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13050532 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12878548.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SIBLEY, JEFFREY; STODDARD, DON ON 05/18/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SIBLEY, JEFFREY; STODDARD, DON ON 05/18/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SIBLEY, JEFFREY; STODDARD, DON ON 05/18/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SIBLEY, JEFFREY; STODDARD, DON ON 05/18/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY SIBLEY, JEFFREY; STODDARD, DON ON 05/18/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY SIBLEY, JEFFREY; STODDARD, DON ON 05/18/2022

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY STODDARD, DON; SIBLEY, JEFFREY ON 05/26/2022

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY STODDARD, DON; SIBLEY, JEFFREY ON 05/26/2022

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY STODDARD, DON; SIBLEY, JEFFREY ON 05/26/2022

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY STODDARD, DON; SIBLEY, JEFFREY ON 05/26/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13084005 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12911994.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13084005 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12911994.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY; EDISON INTERNATIONAL ON 07/06/2022

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY; EDISON INTERNATIONAL ON 07/06/2022

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 07/01/2022 08:32:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 07/01/2022 08:32:00 AM.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/17/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/17/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • HearingDescription: STATUS CONFERENCE; Judge: SANDERS; Department: CX101

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31170462 RECEIVED ON 06/17/2022 02:43:24 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13084005 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12911994.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE REASSIGNED TO CX101 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 09/14/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY; EDISON INTERNATIONAL ON 07/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR 07/01/2022 08:32:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO GLENDA SANDERS EFFECTIVE 06/28/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/14/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketRELATED CASES INCLUDE: ??30-2022-01266797-CU-MT-CXC; 30-2022-01260545-CU-MT-CXC.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY STODDARD, DON; SIBLEY, JEFFREY ON 05/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21163963 RECEIVED ON 05/26/2022 08:12:44 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY STODDARD, DON; SIBLEY, JEFFREY ON 05/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31158085 RECEIVED ON 05/18/2022 08:41:21 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SIBLEY, JEFFREY; STODDARD, DON ON 05/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SIBLEY, JEFFREY; STODDARD, DON ON 05/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SIBLEY, JEFFREY; STODDARD, DON ON 05/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13050532 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12878548.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 05/18/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/29/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant