This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/18/2023 at 07:31:48 (UTC).

JEFFREY S. SIMON VS. STEVEN ANSTEAD

Case Summary

On 08/02/2022 JEFFREY S SIMON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STEVEN ANSTEAD. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFREY S. SIMON

Defendants

STEVEN ANSTEAD

S & B Construction Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David A Simon

Jeffrey S Simon

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13085773 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12913763.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13085773 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12913763.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 08/02/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 08/02/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 08/02/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 08/02/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 08/02/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 08/02/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 10/31/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 10/31/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 10/31/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 10/31/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 11/28/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 11/28/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 12/13/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 12/13/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 12/19/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 12/19/2022

STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/01/2023 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/01/2023 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • HearingDescription: STATUS CONFERENCE; Department: C03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/01/2023 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 12/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11078480 RECEIVED ON 12/19/2022 10:00:15 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 12/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21246633 RECEIVED ON 12/13/2022 09:52:47 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11069470 RECEIVED ON 11/28/2022 12:33:50 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 11/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 10/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31226535 RECEIVED ON 10/31/2022 12:15:04 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 10/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41404833 RECEIVED ON 10/31/2022 12:15:03 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13085773 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12913763.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 08/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 08/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SIMON, JEFFREY S. ON 08/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41366653 RECEIVED ON 08/02/2022 12:25:41 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less