This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/09/2019 at 13:49:32 (UTC).

JEFFREY HOWELL VS VALERIA PEREIRA-HOWELL

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 JEFFREY HOWELL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VALERIA PEREIRA-HOWELL. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1621

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HOWELL, JEFFREY JASON

Respondent

PEREIRA-HOWELL, VALERIA A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 06/16/2017; Filing Party: HOWELL, JEFFREY JASON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 06/16/2017; Filing Party: HOWELL, JEFFREY JASON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 05/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/05/2017 preliminary and final; Filing Party: HOWELL, JEFFREY JASON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 05/05/2017; Filing Party: HOWELL, JEFFREY JASON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 05/05/2017; Filing Party: HOWELL, JEFFREY JASON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/05/2017 preliminary and final; Filing Party: PEREIRA-HOWELL, VALERIA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 05/05/2017; Filing Party: HOWELL, JEFFREY JASON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 05/03/2017; Filing Party: HOWELL, JEFFREY JASON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 03/01/2017; Filing Party: HOWELL, JEFFREY JASON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 03/01/2017; Filing Party: HOWELL, JEFFREY JASON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • SUMMONS 03/01/2017; Filing Party: HOWELL, JEFFREY JASON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 03/01/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: HOWELL, JEFFREY JASON

    Read MoreRead Less